NM SB574 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (65-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.163.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (65-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.163.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cyfd employees of good moral character
Title
Cyfd employees of good moral character
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] PASSED/H (65-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.163. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HLC/HJC-HLC- DP-HJC- DP | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/S (35-2) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP/a | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DNP-CS/DP-SJC | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] SPAC/SJC-SPAC |