NM SB184 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - [LD 27] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - [LD 27] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
U.s. dept. of defense energy gross receipts
Title
U.s. dept. of defense energy gross receipts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | [LD 27] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-26 | House | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (33-9) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |