NM HB48 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-11 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-11 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oil And Gas Future Royalty Rate
Title
Oil And Gas Future Royalty Rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-11 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2024-02-11 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2024-02-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:39 N:28 |
2024-01-30 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-22 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-17 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HCEDC |
2024-01-16 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |