NJ S225 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the four-year "New Jersey Innovation Inspiration School Grant Pilot Program" in DOE to fund non-traditional science, technology, engineering and mathematics programs.
Title
Establishes the four-year "New Jersey Innovation Inspiration School Grant Pilot Program" in DOE to fund non-traditional science, technology, engineering and mathematics programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-1) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |