NJ S1973 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3500 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3500 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local recreation departments and youth serving organizations to have defibrillators for youth athletic events.**
Title
Requires local recreation departments and youth serving organizations to have defibrillators for youth athletic events.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A3500 (2R) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3500 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly