NJ A3500 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local recreation departments and youth serving organizations to have defibrillators for youth athletic events.**
Title
Requires local recreation departments and youth serving organizations to have defibrillators for youth athletic events.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1973 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Amend (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1973 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1973 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Amend (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1973 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Concur by Assembly Amendments (Andrzejczak) (47-16-8) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-1) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S1973 (2R) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (41-19-14) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1973 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3500 (2R)