NJ ACR105 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR142
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR112
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR112
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reconstitutes the "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Title
Reconstitutes the "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Sponsors
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Vincent Polistina [R] |
Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Garnet Hall [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR98 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR98 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (34-0) |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Substituted for SCR98 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (63-16-0) |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR142 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR112 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by ACR142
SCR98 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Substituted by ACR105 (1R)
SCR112 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by ACR142
SCR98 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Substituted by ACR105 (1R)