NJ A3059 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Substituted by S1811 (SCS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Substituted by S1811 (SCS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires use of goods made in the United States for public contracts; requires disclosures by businesses that receive public contracts or development assistance.**
Title
Requires use of goods made in the United States for public contracts; requires disclosures by businesses that receive public contracts or development assistance.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Substituted by S1811 (SCS/2R) |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1811 (Same As) 2015-02-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate