NJ S1811 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2779
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Vetoed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires use of goods made in the United States for public contracts; requires disclosures by businesses that receive public contracts or development assistance.**
Title
Requires use of goods made in the United States for public contracts; requires disclosures by businesses that receive public contracts or development assistance.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3059 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3059 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3059 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3059 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-4) |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (43-24-7) |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Substituted for A3059 (ACS/1R) |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-1) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (36-0) (O'Toole) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Sweeney) |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1811 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A3059 (Same As) 2014-12-18 - Substituted by S1811 (SCS/2R)
A3059 (Same As) 2014-12-18 - Substituted by S1811 (SCS/2R)