NJ A2184 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-13)
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Approved P.L.2014, c.87.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-13)
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Approved P.L.2014, c.87.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires issuance of one free copy of a veteran's death certificate to certain authorized persons upon request.
Title
Requires issuance of one free copy of a veteran's death certificate to certain authorized persons upon request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1752 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1752 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1752 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.87. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Substituted for S1752 (1R) |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora) |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1752 (Same As) 2014-12-01 - Substituted by A2184 (1R)
S708 (Same As) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S708 (Same As) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee