NJ A2006 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Enrolled on May 22 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-07-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reduces maximum capacity of ammunition magazines to 10 rounds; exempts firearms with .22 caliber tubular magazines from 10 round limitation. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces maximum capacity of ammunition magazines to 10 rounds; exempts firearms with .22 caliber tubular magazines from 10 round limitation. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-22 - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 44 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate Substitute For S993 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-11SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2014-05-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (44-34-0)
2014-05-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2014-05-12SenatePassed by the Senate (22-17)
2014-05-12SenateSubstituted for S993 (1R)
2014-05-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-03-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2014-03-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (46-31-0)
2014-03-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-01-16AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S993 (Same As) 2014-05-12 - Substituted by A2006 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback