NJ S993 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S818
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Substituted by A2006 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Substituted by A2006 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces maximum capacity of ammunition magazines to 10 rounds.
Title
Reduces maximum capacity of ammunition magazines to 10 rounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Substituted by A2006 (2R) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S993 (Carry Over) 2014-05-12 - Substituted by A2006 (2R)
A2006 (Same As) 2014-07-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
A2006 (Same As) 2014-07-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly