NJ A103 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1552
Note: Carry Foward to future S2770
Note: Carry Foward to future S2770
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Transparency in Government Act"; provides for establishment of State public finance website.
Title
"Transparency in Government Act"; provides for establishment of State public finance website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A103 (Carry Over) 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A103 (Carry Over) 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1695 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A103 (Carry Over) 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1695 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee