NH SB367 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - V. Remainder eff. 05/20/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - V. Remainder eff. 05/20/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring adjustment of the road toll according to changes in the Consumer Price Index, eliminating certain ramp tolls on the Everett turnpike in the town of Merrimack, and establishing a committee to study the effectiveness and efficiency of the department of transportation.
Title
Requiring adjustment of the road toll according to changes in the Consumer Price Index, eliminating certain ramp tolls on the Everett turnpike in the town of Merrimack, and establishing a committee to study the effectiveness and efficiency of the department of transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. James Rausch [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. John Cebrowski [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. David Campbell [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - Reconsider (Y: 133 N: 202 NV: 12 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - OTP (Y: 193 N: 141 NV: 13 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - (Y: 87 N: 245 NV: 15 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - (Y: 99 N: 231 NV: 17 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - (Y: 126 N: 202 NV: 19 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - OTP (Y: 193 N: 141 NV: 13 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - (Y: 87 N: 245 NV: 15 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - (Y: 99 N: 231 NV: 17 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - (Y: 126 N: 202 NV: 19 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | V. Remainder eff. 05/20/2014 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | IV. Sec. 7 eff. 07/19/2014 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | III. Sec. 4 eff. 07/01/2015 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | II. Sec. 2 & 5 eff. as prov. in Sec. 6 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | I. Sec. 1 & 3 eff. 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2014; Chapter 0017 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1656e Adopted, Voice Vote 05/01/14 |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1656eba Adopted Voice Vote (In recess from 4/30/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Cloutier) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 133-202 |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-141 |
2014-04-23 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1518h (Rep. Schroadter) Amendment Failed Div 73-260 |
2014-04-23 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1505h (Rep. Peterson) Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 87-245 |
2014-04-23 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1504h (Rep. D. McGuire) Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 99-231 |
2014-04-23 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1487h (Rep. Tucker) Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 126-202 |
2014-04-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-04-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 26-11; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/15/14 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-04-01 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 4/9/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Joint Committee - Public Works and Highways & Ways and Means |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1123s, New Title, 1159s, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Sen. Rausch Floor Amendment #2014-1159s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1123s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1123s, New Title, 3/27/14; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 3/20/14, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0860s, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 14Y- 9N; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0860s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Special Ordered to the call of the Chair, Without Objection, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0860s, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/18/14, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means |