NH SB341 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 185-176 05/02/2024 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 185-176 05/02/2024 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mandatory disclosure by school district employees to parents.
Title
Relative to mandatory disclosure by school district employees to parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 185 N: 176 NV: 15 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 185-176 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 |
2024-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2024-1589h: Amendment Failed DV 179-182 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 04/23/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 19 |
2024-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/22/2024 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-16 | House | Public Hearing: 04/22/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 11 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0786s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0786s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0786s, 04/05/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0786s, 03/21/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Special Order to 03/21/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2024 Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0786s, 03/07/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2023-12-11 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |