NH HB627 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring unused vacation and sick leave to be converted to service time for purposes of calculating retirement system benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring unused vacation and sick leave to be converted to service time for purposes of calculating retirement system benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2013-11-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-16HouseRetained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-10-15HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-08-27HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-05-29HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-02-27HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 3/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-02-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-02-13HousePublic Hearing: 2/21/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.203

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback