NH HB584 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0120; Effective 8/15/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0120; Effective 8/15/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to covered prescription drugs.
Title
Relative to covered prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0120; Effective 8/15/2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/24/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 4/10/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2014-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0600h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-08 | House | Amendment #0600h Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0600h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-08-09 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-05-22 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/28/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-03-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/20/2013 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-03-20 | House | Recommit (Rep J.MacKay): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.844-845 |
2013-03-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0807h; House Calendar 23 PG.633 |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0807h for Mar 20 (Vote 14-0; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.581 |
2013-03-06 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/7/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/5/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/26/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.200 |