NH HB532 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0294; Effective Date 9/30/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0294; Effective Date 9/30/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to energy efficiency and clean energy districts.
Title
Relative to energy efficiency and clean energy districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Beatriz Pastor-Bodmer [D] | Rep. John Mann [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 205 N: 132 NV: 21 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 205 N: 132 NV: 29 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - OTPA (Y: 167 N: 140 NV: 55 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 205 N: 132 NV: 29 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - OTPA (Y: 167 N: 140 NV: 55 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-04 | House | Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0294; Effective Date 9/30/2014. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (6/4/14) |
2014-06-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-2031eba New Title, Voice Vote, Adopted (In recess of 6/4/14) |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2031e New Title, Adopted (6/4/14) |
2014-06-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-2010eba, (NT) Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess of 6/4/14) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2010e New Title, Adopted |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1970c; Adopted, Regular Calendar 205-132 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1970c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1970c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-30 | House | Conferee Change: Rep Kaen Replaces Rep Pastor |
2014-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014; 1:00 PM; Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-05-23 | House | Conferee Change: Rep Raymond Replaces Rep Devine |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Odell, and Fuller Clark; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Porter, Carson, Pastor, Devine |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1763s, 1849s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2014-1849s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1763s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Special Order HB 532 to the end of the Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1763s, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 4/30/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2014-01-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2301h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 167-140 |
2014-01-29 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro) Motion Failed Div 135-171 |
2014-01-29 | House | Adopt Amendment #2301h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2013-11-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2301h for Jan 8 (Vote 9-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 4 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-09-12 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-08-28 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/26/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-08-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/20/2013 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-20 | House | Recommit (Rep Porter): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.846 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation for Mar 20, Regular Calendar Part I; House Calendar 23 PG.581 |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/5/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.199 |