NH HB1321 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the relationship between public funding of postsecondary education and workforce development.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the relationship between public funding of postsecondary education and workforce development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1324 | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1076 | |
2012-02-07 | House Full Committee Work Session: 2/13/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2012-01-18 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/3/2012 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==Executive Session Will Follow== | |
2011-12-14 | House Public Hearing: 1/6/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-11-21 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Special Committee on Education Funding Reform; House Journal 7, PG.351 |