NE LB718 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change procedures for adoption of rules and regulations and require publication of certain information
Title
Change procedures for adoption of rules and regulations and require publication of certain information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1724 filed |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1724 |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21597 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB718.pdf |