NE LB1097 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change individual income tax brackets and rates and corporate income tax rates
Title
Change individual income tax brackets and rates and corporate income tax rates
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2014 |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Smith priority bill |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Kintner name added |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | McCoy name added |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22049 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1097.pdf |