NE LB1074 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt changes to federal law regarding banking and finance, change provisions of the Commodity Code, the Credit Union Act, and the Securities Act of Nebraska, adopt the Data Privacy Act and the Public Entities Pooled Investment Act, exempt certain records from public disclosure, and change breach of security provisions and computerized data, criminal history background checks, and vital records
Title
Adopt changes to federal law regarding banking and finance, change provisions of the Commodity Code, the Credit Union Act, and the Securities Act of Nebraska, adopt the Data Privacy Act and the Public Entities Pooled Investment Act, exempt certain records from public disclosure, and change breach of security provisions and computerized data, criminal history background checks, and vital records
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Legislature - Slama AM3253 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Legislature - DeBoer AM3279 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2560 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Dungan AM2820 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Legislature - Slama AM3253 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Legislature - DeBoer AM3279 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2560 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Dungan AM2820 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST68 recorded |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST68 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST68 |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Slama AM3253 adopted |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Slama AM3253 to ER99 filed |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | DeBoer AM3279 adopted |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | DeBoer AM3279 to ER99 filed |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER99 adopted |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER99 filed |
2024-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER99 |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2560 adopted |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Dungan AM2820 adopted |
2024-03-12 | Legislature | Dungan AM2820 to AM2560 filed |
2024-02-29 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2560 filed |
2024-02-29 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2560 |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |