NE LB1070 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change closing dates and filing deadlines for campaign statements of ballot question committees
Title
Change closing dates and filing deadlines for campaign statements of ballot question committees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |