ND SB2187 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 6-09-47 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a Bank of North Dakota medical facility infrastructure loan program; to provide for a report; to provide for a transfer; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
A Bank of North Dakota medical facility infrastructure loan program; to provide for a report; to provide for a transfer; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Bill Bowman [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] |
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Richard Holman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/03 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-01 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2013-05-01 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Weisz Anderson Muscha |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Anderson Larsen Axness |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-09 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 3 |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 5 2 |
2013-04-03 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-04-03 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0 |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |