ND HB1195 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding a juvenile delinquency offense code.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding a juvenile delinquency offense code.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Sen. Ryan Braunberger [D] |
Sen. Diane Larson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03 |
2023-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor 03/30 |
2023-03-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-24 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 0 |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 03:12 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |