NC S547 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-08-23 - Ch. SL 2013-396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Energy Savings Contracting Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Savings Contracting Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-25 - Motion 9 To Concur Third Reading (Y: 4 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-07-24 - Motion 9 To Concur Second Reading (Y: 5 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-07-22 - Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-22 - M7 Postpone To A Day Certain Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 57 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-07-18 - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - SECOND READING (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-23 Ch. SL 2013-396
2013-08-23 Signed by Gov. 8/23/2013
2013-07-26 Pres. To Gov. 07/26/2013
2013-07-25 Ratified
2013-07-25SenateOrdered Enrolled
2013-07-25SenateConcurred On 3rd Reading
2013-07-24SenateConcurred On 2nd Reading
2013-07-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/24/2013
2013-07-23SenateRec To Concur H Com Sub
2013-07-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-07-18HousePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2013
2013-07-18HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-07-17HousePlaced On Cal For 07/18/2013
2013-07-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-07-17HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-06-27HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2013-06-27HouseReptd Fav
2013-05-07HouseRef to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
2013-05-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-05-06HouseRec From Senate
2013-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-05-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2013-05-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-04-16SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2013-04-16SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2013-04-16SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-04-01SenateRef to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance
2013-04-01SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-03-28SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2013&BillID=S547&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S547v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S547v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S547v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S547v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S547v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S547v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S547v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=252
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1234
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1257
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1258
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=846
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=870

Bill Comments

feedback