MT SB107 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise deviate sexual conduct laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise deviate sexual conduct laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - (H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18 Chapter Number Assigned
2013-04-18Senate(S) Signed by Governor
2013-04-16Senate(S) Transmitted to Governor
2013-04-15House(H) Signed by Speaker
2013-04-15Senate(S) Signed by President
2013-04-12 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2013-04-12Senate(S) Returned from Enrolling
2013-04-11Senate(S) Sent to Enrolling
2013-04-11House(H) Returned to Senate
2013-04-10House(H) 3rd Reading Concurred
2013-04-10House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2013-04-09House(H) 2nd Reading Concurred
2013-04-09House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2013-04-09House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2013-04-08House(H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (H) Judiciary
2013-04-04House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary
2013-03-15House(H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2013-03-07House(H) First Reading
2013-03-07House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2013-02-21Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2013-02-20Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2013-02-20Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2013-02-19Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2013-02-19Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2013-02-14 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2013-02-14Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary
2013-02-14Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary
2013-02-08Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2013-01-25Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary
2013-01-25Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary
2013-01-21Senate(S) Hearing (S) Judiciary
2013-01-10Senate(S) Sponsor List Modified
2013-01-09Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2013-01-09Senate(S) First Reading
2013-01-08 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2013-01-08Senate(S) Introduced
2013-01-08 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2012-12-21 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2012-11-13 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2012-10-22 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2012-10-19 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2012-10-17 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2012-10-17 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2012-10-17 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
2012-10-17 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2012-10-12 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2011-10-23 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback