MT HB184 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise law on real estate broker liability for sale by owner by salesperson
Title
Revise law on real estate broker liability for sale by owner by salesperson
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-24 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Conference |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-09 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred |
2013-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2013-03-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-03-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-15 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-11 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-11 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-10 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2012-12-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2012-12-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-12-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-12-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |