MS SB2805 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Sections 75-24-71 Through 75-24-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Pyramid Promotional Schemes; To Regulate Recruiting Literature And Information Of Bona Fide Inventory Repurchase Programs; To Amend Sections 75-24-51, 75-24-53 And 75-24-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove References To Pyramid Schemes; To Bring Forward Sections 75-24-55, 75-24-61 And 75-24-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Regulate Franchise Companies, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pyramid promotional schemes; regulate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-08 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment Tabled |
2018-03-06 | House | Read the Third Time |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |