MS SB2438 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Secretary Of State, With The Approval Of The Governor, To Enter Into Agreements With The United States Of America And Its Agencies For The Purpose Of Consolidating Their Respective Holdings Into Contiguous Tracts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Cat Island; authorize Secretary of State to exchange certain property located on with National Park Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | House | Conferees Named Eure,Guice,Crawford |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Blount,Doty,Tindell |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-04 | House | Amended |
2015-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |