MS HB1516 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-615, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Before A Parent Pays Certain Costs For The Support Of Certain Youth Who Have Been Adjudicated Delinquent, The Parent Of The Child Shall Receive An Itemized Bill Pertaining To The Costs; To Require The Youth Court To Provide An Opportunity For The Parent To Request An Adjustment Of Such Costs; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Costs associated for care of certain delinquent children; require itemized bills be given to parents before requiring to pay.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hines [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,Wilemon,Watson |
2013-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Hines,Thomas,Burnett |
2013-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2013-02-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-14 | House | Amended |
2013-02-13 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | House | DR - TSDP: YF To JB |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Youth and Family Affairs;Judiciary B |