MS HB1139 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-7-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Taking Of Deer During Any Open Season On Deer With Primitive Weapons By A Person With Any Legal Weapon Of Choice On Private Lands If The Person Is The Landowner, Lessee, Member Of A Hunting Club Or A Guest Of Either; To Provide That If A License Is Required For The Taking Of Deer Upon Private Lands, The Hunter Shall Purchase And Have In His Or Her Possession A Valid Primitive Weapon License, Sportsman's License Or Lifetime Sportsman's License; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Primitive weapon season; authorize use of firearm of choice upon certain private lands during.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. Ken Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 20 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 20 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-14 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Failed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2013-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |