MO SB907 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Carthage School District to transfer unrestricted funds from the incidental to the capital projects funds in the 2014-2015 school year to complete student safety-related projects
Title
Allows the Carthage School District to transfer unrestricted funds from the incidental to the capital projects funds in the 2014-2015 school year to complete student safety-related projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-27 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor - Consent |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Education Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | S First Read--SB 907-Richard |