MO SB887 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 887-Schaefer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 887-Schaefer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each public institution of higher education to annually report the institution's administrative costs as a percent of its operating budget
Title
Requires each public institution of higher education to annually report the institution's administrative costs as a percent of its operating budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 887-Schaefer |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 887-Schaefer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=30614363 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB887.pdf |