MO SB473 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (4177S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (4177S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Attorney General to sue the federal government to enforce federal immigration laws
Title
Requires the Attorney General to sue the federal government to enforce federal immigration laws
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (4177S.02C) | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 473-Kraus | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=46 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB473.pdf |