MO SB325 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various laws relating to professional registration
Title
Modifies various laws relating to professional registration
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R] | Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-11 | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-05-11 | S concurs in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-11 | Motion to request H recede or grant conference S withdrawn | |
2011-05-11 | Motion to reconsider the motion to request H grant conference S adopted | |
2011-05-11 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2011-05-11 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-11 | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-05-11 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(1709L04.01L) | |
2011-05-09 | Bill Laid over | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-27 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee | |
2011-04-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Hearing Conducted H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee | |
2011-04-19 | Referred H Professional Registration and Licensing Committee | |
2011-04-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-14 | H First Read | |
2011-04-14 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-11 | Perfected | |
2011-04-07 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-14 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-02-23 | S First Read--SB 325-Wasson |