MO HB2578 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that an unborn child shall not be considered an employee for civil actions
Title
Provides that an unborn child shall not be considered an employee for civil actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 |
2024-04-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |