MO HB253 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit for student loan repayment
Title
Authorizes a tax credit for student loan repayment
Sponsors
Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB253&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0253I.PDF |