MO HB240 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-20 - Referred: Elections(H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-20 - Referred: Elections(H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a person to submit a specified form of photo identification in order to vote in a public election with specified exemptions
Title
Requires a person to submit a specified form of photo identification in order to vote in a public election with specified exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-20 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB240&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0240I.PDF |