MN SF4982 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resource management account dedication increase provision
Title
Resource management account dedication increase provision
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4915 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy