MN HF4728 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of revenue required to establish online system to claim the political contribution refund, political contribution refund program amended to allow electronic transfer between the Campaign Finance and Public Disclosure Board and the Department of Revenue, and money appropriated.
Title
Commissioner of revenue required to establish online system to claim the political contribution refund, political contribution refund program amended to allow electronic transfer between the Campaign Finance and Public Disclosure Board and the Department of Revenue, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] |
Rep. Pam Altendorf [R] | Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Amanda Hemmingsen-Jaeger [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2024-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2024-04-08 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-03-13 | House | Authors added Hemmingsen-Jaeger and Pursell |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4431 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended