MN HF3486 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Hanson, J.
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Hanson, J.
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Substance use disorder treatment; licensed alcohol and drug counselors continuing education requirements modified, religious objections to placements in substance use disorder treatment programs allowed, comprehensive assessment requirements modified, courts or other placement authorities prohibited from compelling an individual to participate in religious elements of substance use disorder treatment, and report required.
Title
Substance use disorder treatment; licensed alcohol and drug counselors continuing education requirements modified, religious objections to placements in substance use disorder treatment programs allowed, comprehensive assessment requirements modified, courts or other placement authorities prohibited from compelling an individual to participate in religious elements of substance use disorder treatment, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3459 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety