MN HF2680 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - Author added Erhardt
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - Author added Erhardt
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Wolf management provisions modified, wolf baiting limits provided, and temporary suspension of wolf hunt provided.
Title
Wolf management provisions modified, wolf baiting limits provided, and temporary suspension of wolf hunt provided.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] | Rep. Susan Allen [D] | Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] | Rep. Yvonne Selcer [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Author added Erhardt |
2014-05-02 | House | Author added Fischer |
2014-04-25 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2014-03-12 | House | Author added Slocum |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |