MI SB0639 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-02 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-02 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; other; ignition interlock servicing center to be included within the definition of motor vehicle repair facility; revise motor vehicle service and repair act to provide. Amends sec. 2 of 1974 PA 300 (MCL 257.1302). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0637'13
Title
Businesses; other; ignition interlock servicing center to be included within the definition of motor vehicle repair facility; revise motor vehicle service and repair act to provide. Amends sec. 2 of 1974 PA 300 (MCL 257.1302). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0637'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 645 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-11-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 645 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-11-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-02 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2014-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-11-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-11-06 | House | Received On 11/06/2014 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 645 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |