MI SB0152 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0479'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; evidence; electronic recording of certain custodial interrogation sessions; require under certain circumstances and revise procedures for determining admissibility as evidence. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding secs. 7, 8, 9, 10 & 11 to ch. III.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; evidence; electronic recording of certain custodial interrogation sessions; require under certain circumstances and revise procedures for determining admissibility as evidence. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding secs. 7, 8, 9, 10 & 11 to ch. III.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-06 - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 836 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 625 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 92 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0479'12
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:02 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:15 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-27SenatePresented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 9:54 Am
2012-12-06SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-06SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-06SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2012-12-06Senate Roll Call # 836 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2012-12-06SenateHouse Substitute H-3 Concurred In
2012-11-29SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-11-29SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-11-28HouseReturned To Senate
2012-11-28HouseInserted Full Title
2012-11-28HousePassed Roll Call # 625 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2012-11-28HouseRead A Third Time
2012-11-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-11-27HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted And Amended
2012-11-27HouseRead A Second Time
2012-11-08HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-11-08HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2011-04-14HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2011-04-14HouseRead A First Time
2011-04-14HouseReceived On 04/14/2011
2011-04-14SenatePassed Roll Call # 92 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2011-03-24SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2011-03-24SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2011-03-24SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2011-03-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2011-03-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2011-03-09SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2011-02-16SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

HB4322 (Same As) 2011-02-24 - Printed Bill Filed 02/24/2011

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0152
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0152.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0152.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0152.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0152.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0479.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2011-SJ-03-09-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2011-SJ-04-14-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-11-08-073.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-11-28-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-06-077.htm

Bill Comments

feedback