MI HB5236 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 332'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 332'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; criminal forfeiture provisions in the revised judicature act of 1961; amend to reflect changes in human trafficking law. Amends sec. 4701 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.4701). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5234'14
Title
Crimes; other; criminal forfeiture provisions in the revised judicature act of 1961; amend to reflect changes in human trafficking law. Amends sec. 4701 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.4701). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5234'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 556 (Y: 103 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 556 (Y: 103 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 619 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 556 (Y: 103 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 619 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Assigned Pa 332'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/16/2014 @ 3:41 Pm |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2014 @ 11:50 Am |
2014-10-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:36 Pm |
2014-10-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-10-02 | House | Roll Call # 556 Yeas 103 Nays 4 |
2014-10-02 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-10-02 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-10-02 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-10-02 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 619 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-03-19 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2014-01-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Ed Mcbroom |