MI HB5191 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-05 - Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services
Pending: Senate Families & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-05 - Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services
Pending: Senate Families & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities; nursing homes; reporting requirements for abuse or neglect in nursing homes; modify. Amends sec. 21771 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.21771).
Title
Health facilities; nursing homes; reporting requirements for abuse or neglect in nursing homes; modify. Amends sec. 21771 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.21771).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-05 | Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services | |
2009-11-04 | Transmitted | |
2009-11-04 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 525 Yeas 96 Nays 8 | |
2009-11-04 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-11-04 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-11-04 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-11-04 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-10-14 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-10-14 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-07-15 | Printed Bill Filed 07/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Referred To Committee On Senior Health, Security, And Retirement | |
2009-07-14 | Read A First Time | |
2009-07-14 | Introduced By Representative Jimmy Womack |
Subjects
Health facilities, nursing homes
Health facilities, patient safety
State agencies (existing), community health
Health facilities, patient safety
State agencies (existing), community health