ME LD1778 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Revise the Description of Commercial Fishing Vessels That Are Exempt from Attachment
Title
An Act To Revise the Description of Commercial Fishing Vessels That Are Exempt from Attachment
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Cooper [D] | Sen. Christopher Johnson [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Charles Kruger [D] |
Rep. Walter Kumiega [D] | Rep. Stephen Moriarty [D] | Rep. Charles Priest [D] | Rep. Jeremy Saxton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2014-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-709), in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-709) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-709) |
2014-03-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-02-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2014-02-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2014-02-18 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |