ME LD1734 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Cold Case Homicide Unit in the Department of the Attorney General
Title
An Act To Create a Cold Case Homicide Unit in the Department of the Attorney General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #593 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-708) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-535) thereto |
2014-04-16 | Senate | 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 593 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-708) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-535) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-708) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-535) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-535) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-708) READ and ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-708). |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, the Senate, Under suspension of the rules, RECONSIDERED whereby Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-708), in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-708), in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-708) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-708) |
2014-03-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2014-01-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |