MD SJ4 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to authorize and fund a specified project to dredge behind the Conowingo Dam in order to preserve the dam's capability to block pollutants in the Susquehanna River from reaching the Chesapeake Bay; and providing that a copy of the resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to specified individuals.
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m. |
2014-02-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {813423/2 Adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {363023/1 Withdrawn |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {363023/1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) {233922/1 Adopted |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {334537/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jacobs) Adopted |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {334537/1 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Congress, U.S.
Dredging
Environment
Environmental Matters
Pollution
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control
Water
Congress, U.S.
Dredging
Environment
Environmental Matters
Pollution
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control
Water